Suleman, Arif Abdul (CPSO#: 60541)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Nairobi, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 2017