Suller Marti, Ana (CPSO#: 110611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 08 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Valencia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London ON  N6A 5C1
Phone: (519) 661-2111
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANA SULLER MARTI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SULLER MARTI is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. SULLER MARTI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SULLER MARTI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SULLER MARTI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. SULLER MARTI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. SULLER MARTI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 07 Sep 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018