Sullivan, Arthur Kenneth (CPSO#: 82006)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Vermont, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 505
465 Richmond Road
Ottawa ON  K2A 1Z1
Phone: (613) 422-3843
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Apr 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARTHUR KENNETH SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2004