Sullivan, Brian Joseph (CPSO#: 51832)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sullivan Cardiology
70 Ferguson Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8R 1L4
Phone: (905) 529-8926
Fax: (905) 529-2280
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Sullivan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sullivan ( CPSO# 51832 )

Business Address:
Sullivan Cardiology
70 Ferguson Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8R 1L4
Phone Number: (905) 529-8926

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN JOSEPH SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983