Sullivan, Hugh Patrick (CPSO#: 52421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Nov 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sullivan Cardiology
70 Ferguson Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8R 1L4
Phone: (905) 529-8926
Fax: (905) 529-2280
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hugh P. Sullivan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sullivan ( CPSO# 52421 )

Business Address:
Sullivan Cadiology
70 Ferguson Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8R 1L4
Phone Number: (905) 529-8926

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUGH PATRICK SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1984