Sullivan, John Renford (CPSO#: 74401)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sydney, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001