Sullivan, Patrick Joseph (CPSO#: 52614)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Rm B310, PO Box 249C
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Fax: (613) 761-5209
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patrick J. Sullivan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sullivan ( CPSO# 52614 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite 249C
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4169

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK JOSEPH SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1987 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1985