Sullivan, Paul Anthony (CPSO#: 70190)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Sunnyside Building Suite 220
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6030
Fax: (416) 530-6520
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Regional hospital
Bariatric Clinic
2115 Finch Ave W
Ste 106
Toronto ON  M3N 2V6
Canada
Phone: (416) 747-3720
Fax: (417) 747-3731
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Kensington Cancer Screening Clinic
340 College st
Ste 600
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Anthony Sullivan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sullivan ( CPSO# 70190 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Sunnyside Building
220 - 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL ANTHONY SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001