Sullivan, Stephen Norman (CPSO#: 29751)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Sep 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Sep 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 30 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Sep 1994