Sullivan, William Francis (CPSO#: 56881)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Family Practice Unit
61 Queen Street East 3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7426
Fax: (416) 867-7498
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Surrey Place Centre
2 Surrey Place
Toronto ON  M5S 2C2
Canada
Phone: (416) 925-2169 Ext. 2264
Fax: (416) 923-8476
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William F. Sullivan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Sullivan ( CPSO# 56881 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Family Practice Unit
61 Queen Street East 3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7426

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM FRANCIS SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Oct 1997
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1987