Sully, Irma Nancy (CPSO#: 72740)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Mar 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Creole, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
330 Sparks Street
(AMSPM)
Ottawa ON  K1A 0N8
Phone: (613) 990-9436
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Feb 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRMA NANCY SULLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 24 Jan 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jan 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2001