Sulowski, Christopher Andrew (CPSO#: 84710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
1280 Main St. W
2N49
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75607
Fax: (905) 524-5707
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sulowski Wyatt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Wyatt ( CPSO# 91500 )
Dr. C. Sulowski ( CPSO# 84710 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
1280 Main Street West
2N49
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ANDREW SULOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2010