Sultan, Ghazala (CPSO#: 84874)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham Kent Family Health Team
20 Emma St #207
Chatham ON  N7L 5K5
Phone: (519) 354-2172 Ext. 4
Fax: (866) 539-6714
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ghazala Sultan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sultan ( CPSO# 84874 )

Business Address:
Chatham-Kent Family Health Team
207 - 20 Emma Street
Chatham ON  N7L 5K5
Phone Number: (519) 350-2172

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GHAZALA SULTAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULTAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2008