Sultan, Meshal Abdulkarim (CPSO#: 94918)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Jul 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2011 to 23 Jun 2011
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 14 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jul 2017