Sultan, Nabil Mohamed (CPSO#: 80725)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
A2 337
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8385
Fax: (519) 685-8429
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sultan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sultan ( CPSO# 80725 )

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
A2-337 - 800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8385

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NABIL MOHAMED SULTAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULTAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008