Sultana, Shahida (CPSO#: 78726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Chittagong, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Fax: (905) 472-7004
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHIDA SULTANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULTANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2003 to 31 Jan 2003
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2006