Sumabat, Washington Ocampo (CPSO#: 51833)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 05 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino, Ilocano, Tagalog

Education:University of The East Philippines, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2009