Sumaily, Ahmad Mohmmad A (CPSO#: 110553)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 07 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Division of Endocrinology &
Metabolism
76 Grenville street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 3237510
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMAD MOHMMAD A SUMAILY may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SUMAILY is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. SUMAILY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SUMAILY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SUMAILY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. SUMAILY ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. SUMAILY ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2016 to 06 Oct 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 07 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 21 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 22 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018