Sumanac, Katica (CPSO#: 74178)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
60 Hatt Street
Dundas ON  L9H 7T6
Phone: (905) 627-1800
Fax: (905) 627-1700
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATICA SUMANAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUMANAC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2006