Summerfield, Robert Arthur Egan (CPSO#: 65403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tanner Clinic
2121 North 1700 West
Layton UT  84041
United States
Phone: (801) 773-4840
Fax: (801) 525-8137

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Utah

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 14 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT ARTHUR EGAN SUMMERFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUMMERFIELD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993