Sumner, Glen Linnell (CPSO#: 67630)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Oct 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008