Sun, Alexander Yi-Jen (CPSO#: 61025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2126
Fax: (416) 946-6561
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Yi-Jen Sun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sun ( CPSO# 61025 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
University Health Network
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2126

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER YI-JEN SUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1991