Sun, Charles Young (CPSO#: 25396)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 2012