Sun, Christopher Ke-Jian (CPSO#: 88663)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ruddy Building
4th Floor
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Phone: (416) 243-3706
Fax: (416) 243-3645
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Sun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sun ( CPSO# 88663 )

Business Address:
Ruddy Building
4th Floor
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Phone Number: (416) 243-3706

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER KE-JIAN SUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011