Sun, Clement Kwang (CPSO#: 27390)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1288 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1M6
Phone: (416) 462-0228
Fax: (416) 461-7690
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

226 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2T8
Canada
Phone: (705) 740-0228
Fax: (705) 740-0223
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

166 Division Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3M6
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-0228
Fax: (613) 544-0224
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

4113a lawrence east
Scarborough ON  M1E 2S2
Canada
Phone: (647) 931-7316
Fax: (416) 281-7777
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

664 Barton st East
Hamilton ON  L8L 3A4
Canada
Phone: (289) 799-2135
Fax: (289) 667-0022
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

84 carden
Guelph ON  N1H 3A3
Canada
Phone: (519) 837-0228
Fax: (519) 837-6853
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

225 John St
Hamilton ON  L8N 2C7
Canada
Phone: (905) 526 0228
Fax: (905) 526 0223
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

3079 Princess
Kingston ON  K7P0K6
Canada
Phone: 6137660798
Fax: 6137666588
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

1440 Main st East
Hamilton ON  L8K6M3
Canada
Phone: 9055470228
Fax: 9055470223
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

193 Colborne Street
Brantford, Ontario
Brantford ON  N3T 2K7
Canada
Phone: (519) 720-0228
Fax: (519) 7570229
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

91 Queen St South Unit 7
Kitchener, Ontario
Kitchener ON  N2G 2N3
Canada
Phone: (519) 579-0228
Fax: (519) 584-0223
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clement Sun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sun ( CPSO# 27390 )

Business Address:
664 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 3A4
Phone Number: (289) 799-2135

Business Address:
226 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2T8
Phone Number: (705) 740-0228

Business Address:
162 Division Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3M6
Phone Number: (613) 544-0228

Business Address:
3079 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7P 0K6
Phone Number: (613) 766-0798

Business Address:
4113A Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1E 2S2
Phone Number: (647) 931-7316

Business Address:
225 John Street South
Hamilton ON  L8N 2C7
Phone Number: (905) 526-0228

Business Address:
1440 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8K 6M3
Phone Number: (905) 547-0289

Business Address:
193 Colborne Street
Brantford ON  N3T 2G8
Phone Number: (519) 720-0228

Business Address:
84 Carden Street
Guelph ON  N1H 3A3
Phone Number: (519) 837-0228

Business Address:
91 Queen Street South
Unit 7
Kitchener ON  N2G 4M7
Phone Number: (519) 576-0228

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLEMENT KWANG SUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2006

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 11, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)