Sun, Louise Ying Pw (CPSO#: 88752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiac Anesthesiology
Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street, H2410
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: 613-759-8870
Fax: 613-696-7099
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louise Sun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sun ( CPSO# 88752 )

Business Address:
Division of Cardiac Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street, H2410
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4379

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUISE YING PW SUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Nov 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013