Sunbul, Ghadah Omar Rasheed (CPSO#: 82346)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 25 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 25 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 16 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PEAP - Resident - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 25 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2016