Sundaram, Rajah Sridhar (CPSO#: 51835)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jul 1994