Sundaresan, Ramanadhan Sudhir (CPSO#: 54522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite M1859
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sudhir Sundaresan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2008

Dr. R. Sundaresan ( CPSO# 54522 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa


Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. RAMANADHAN SUDHIR SUNDARESAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUNDARESAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1989