Sunderland, Dorothy Jean (CPSO#: 57980)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone: (705) 445-4111
Fax: (705) 445-8250
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Langford and Dorothy Sunderland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Langford ( CPSO# 58483 )
Dr. D. Sunderland ( CPSO# 57980 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone Number: (705) 445-4111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOROTHY JEAN SUNDERLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUNDERLAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1988