Sundin, Karin Evelyn (CPSO#: 64099)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009