Sung, Lillian (CPSO#: 66662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Hematology/Oncology
Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5287
Fax: (416) 813-5979
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 31 Oct 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILLIAN SUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Oct 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1997