Superina, Diann (CPSO#: 32918)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 24 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Feb 2015