Superina, Riccardo Antonio (CPSO#: 51836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:McGill University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ann and Robert H. Lurie Children's
225. East Chicago Avenue
Box 57
Chicago, Illinois
Chicago IL  60611
United States
Phone: (312) 227-4040
Fax: (312) 227-9387

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICCARDO ANTONIO SUPERINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUPERINA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985