Suppal, Priya (CPSO#: 65159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shoppers World Medical Center
Unit 144
499 Main Street South
Brampton ON  L6Y 1N7
Phone: (905) 796-6570
Fax: (905) 796-3977
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Main Street Medical Centre
Suite 9
10886 Hurontario
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Canada
Phone: (905) 846-9911
Fax: (905) 846-9299
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Castlemore Family Medical Centre
9960 Airport Road
Suite 2
Brampton ON  L6S 0C5
Canada
Phone: (905) 799-2272
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

169 Queen Street East
Suite 102
Brampton ON  L6V 1B3
Canada
Phone: 905-216-2680
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Suppal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Suppal ( CPSO# 65159 )

Business Address:
Castlemore Family Medical Centre Walk-In
Clinic & Pharmacy
Suite 2
9960 Airport Road
Brampton ON  L6S 0C5
Phone Number: (905) 799-2272


Corporation Name: Dr. Priya Suppal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Suppal ( CPSO# 65159 )
Dr. S. Suppal ( CPSO# 27056 )

Business Address:
Main Street Medical Centre
Suite A-9
10886 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone Number: (905) 846-9911


Corporation Name: Karunakaran Kutty Suppal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Suppal ( CPSO# 65159 )
Dr. P. Karunakaran Kutty ( CPSO# 29096 )

Business Address:
West GTA Endoscopy
Suite A-7
10886 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone Number: (905) 495-5200

Business Address:
Shoppers World Medical Centre
144 - 499 Main Street South
Brampton ON  L6Y 1N7
Phone Number: (905) 796-6570


Corporation Name: Dr. Suppal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Suppal ( CPSO# 65159 )

Business Address:
Unit 9
10886 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone Number: (905) 846-9911

Business Address:
Unit 20
9960 Airport Road
Brampton ON  L6S 0C5
Phone Number: (905) 799-2272

Business Address:
Unit 144
499 Main Street South
Brampton ON  L6Y 1N7
Phone Number: (905) 796-6570

Business Address:
169 Queen Street East
Suite 102
Brampton ON  L6V 1B3
Phone Number: (905) 216-2680


Corporation Name: Suppal Luthra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Suppal ( CPSO# 65159 )
Dr. S. Luthra ( CPSO# 79438 )

Business Address:
169 Queen Street East
Suite 102
Brampton ON  L6W 2B2
Phone Number: (905) 216-0663

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRIYA SUPPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUPPAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993