Suppal, Sushil Kumar (CPSO#: 27056)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Calcutta, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Priya Suppal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Suppal ( CPSO# 65159 )
Dr. S. Suppal ( CPSO# 27056 )

Business Address:
Main Street Medical Centre
Suite A-9
10886 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone Number: (905) 846-9911

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 07 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 30 May 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2008