Suppiah, Nagappan (CPSO#: 72062)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 6 Hebbard Place St John's NL A1A 5J6
Date Received: 25 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 16 Jan 1998 to 15 Jan 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017