Sur, Monalisa (CPSO#: 77434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Punjab University India, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Anatomical Pathology
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 42051
Fax: (905) 389-1698
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R & M Sur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sur ( CPSO# 77434 )
Dr. R. Sur ( CPSO# 77435 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Radiation Oncology Department
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9711

Business Address:
Henderson Hospital
Department of Anatomical Pathology
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Hematological Pathology Effective: 29 Jul 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2002
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 May 2004
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 04 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Monalisa Sur may practise medicine independently in anatomical and
            hematological pathology.