Sur, Smeeksha Singh (CPSO#: 81179)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Punjab University India, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 21
1098 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6R 3A5
Phone: (905) 458-6999
Fax: (905) 458-5202
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Smeeksha Sur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Singh ( CPSO# 78621 )
Dr. S. Sur ( CPSO# 81179 )

Business Address:
Unit 21
1098 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6R 3A5
Phone Number: (905) 458-6999


Corporation Name: S.P. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Singh ( CPSO# 78621 )
Dr. S. Sur ( CPSO# 81179 )

Business Address:
Unit 21
1098 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6R 3A5
Phone Number: (905) 458-6999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SMEEKSHA SINGH SUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 28 Jun 2004 to 25 Jul 2004
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2004 to 22 Aug 2004
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2005