Surak, Aimann (CPSO#: 96380)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 24 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Tichreen, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 8346
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AIMANN SURAK shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SURAK is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. SURAK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SURAK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SURAK shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SURAK is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SURAK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jul 2011 to 12 Aug 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018