Surangiwala, Sabiha Mohamed (CPSO#: 81459)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Pune, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga ON  L5N 2Y1
Phone: (905) 567-9911
Fax: (905) 567-9011
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sabiha Surangiwala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Surangiwala ( CPSO# 81459 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga ON  L5N 2Y1
Phone Number: (905) 567-9911

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SABIHA MOHAMED SURANGIWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURANGIWALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2006