Surbey, Glenn Duncan (CPSO#: 57215)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 350
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 847-1133
Fax: (905) 847-9782
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Glenn Surbey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Surbey ( CPSO# 57215 )

Business Address:
350 - 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 847-1133

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLENN DUNCAN SURBEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURBEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1987