Suri, Permjit Singh (CPSO#: 57082)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:Jiwaji University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
106 Centrepointe Drive
Nepean ON  K2G 6B1
Phone: (613) 224-6151 Ext. 22
Fax: (613) 224-7228
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

292 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1L 6B7
Canada
Phone: (613) 744-4055
Fax: (613) 744-0914
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

2525 Lancaster Road
Ottawa ON  K1B 4L5
Canada
Phone: (613) 260-5666
Fax: (613) 688-2255
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P & M Suri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Suri ( CPSO# 57082 )
Dr. M. Straszak-Suri ( CPSO# 57056 )

Business Address:
106 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6B1
Phone Number: (613) 224-6157

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PERMJIT SINGH SURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1988