Surkes, Jan (CPSO#: 57111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 112
20644 Eastleigh Crescent
Langley BC  V3A 4C4
Phone: (604) 533-8803
Fax: (604) 533-8581

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAN SURKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURKES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2008