Surma, Beata (CPSO#: 99450)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Sep 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Queensway Blvd W
Suite 630
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 273-7747
Fax: (905) 273-7757
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beata Surma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Surma ( CPSO# 99450 )

Business Address:
Suite 630
101 Queensway Boulevard West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 273-7747

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Aug 2014 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 27 Mar 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jan 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Beata Surma may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.