Surmawala, Amirali (CPSO#: 103969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Mission
Diane Morrison Hospice
35 Waller Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 7G4
Phone: (613) 601-1136
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIRALI SURMAWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURMAWALA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2017