Surti, Bhadreshchandra Venilal (CPSO#: 52247)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Gujarat University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 455-5110 Ext. 47592
Fax: (519) 455-2677
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

580 Algoma Street,
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 8C5
Canada
Phone: 807 343 4300
Fax: 807 343 4373
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Surti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Surti ( CPSO# 52247 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Institute
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 455-5110

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BHADRESHCHANDRA VENILAL SURTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURTI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987