Suryavanshi, Shveta (CPSO#: 87912)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Gorakhpur University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite A Upper level
568 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W6
Phone: (519) 336-1800
Fax: (519) 336-1801
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Suryavanshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Suryavanshi ( CPSO# 87860 )
Dr. S. Suryavanshi ( CPSO# 87912 )

Business Address:
Upper Suite A
568 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W6
Phone Number: (519) 336-1800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHVETA SURYAVANSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SURYAVANSHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2007

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 11, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)