Suskin, Neville Gordon (CPSO#: 64624)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Care Centre
Room B3-628
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 663-3488
Fax: (519) 646-6139
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

339 Windermere Rd
University Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 663-3488
Fax: (519) 646-6139
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suskin and Ettler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Suskin ( CPSO# 64624 )
Dr. H. Ettler ( CPSO# 66988 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Room C6-124G - 339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
Room B3-628
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 663-3488

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEVILLE GORDON SUSKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUSKIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1991