Sussman, Gordon Lloyd (CPSO#: 50013)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
202 St Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4V 1R2
Phone: (416) 944-8333
Fax: (416) 944-1582
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon Sussman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sussman ( CPSO# 50013 )

Business Address:
202 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4V 1R2
Phone Number: (416) 944-8333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON LLOYD SUSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUSSMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1983